UNITED STATES
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Washington, DC 20549
FORM 8-K
CURRENT REPORT
PURSUANT TO SECTION 13 OR 15(d) OF THE
SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934
Date of Report (Date of earliest event reported): January 6, 2014
TetraLogic Pharmaceuticals Corporation
(Exact name of Registrant as specified in its charter)
Delaware |
|
001-36208 |
|
42-1604756 |
(State or Other Jurisdiction |
|
(Commission |
|
(I.R.S. Employer |
343 Phoenixville Pike
Malvern, PA 19355
(610) 889-9900
(Address, Including Zip Code, and Telephone Number, Including Area Code, of Registrants Principal Executive
Offices)
Not Applicable
(Former name or former address, if changed since last report)
Check the appropriate box below if the Form 8-K filing is intended to simultaneously satisfy the filing obligation of the registrant under any of the following provisions:
o Written communications pursuant to Rule 425 under the Securities Act (17 CFR 230.425)
o Soliciting material pursuant to Rule 14a-12 under the Exchange Act (17CFR 240.14a-12)
o Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 14d-2(b) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14d-2(b))
o Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 13e-4(c) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.13e-4(c))
Item 5.02 Departure of Directors or Certain Officers; Election of Directors; Appointment of Certain Officers; Compensatory Arrangements of Certain Officers.
On January 6, 2013, Dr. David Weng resigned as Chief Medical Officer and Senior Vice President Clinical Services of TetraLogic Pharmaceuticals Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, (the Company), with such resignation to be effective as of February 28, 2014. Dr. Lesley Russell, the Companys Chief Operating Officer, will undertake the role of Chief Medical Officer for the Company upon Dr. Wengs departure.
SIGNATURE
Pursuant to the requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, as amended, the Company has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned hereunto duly authorized.
Dated: January 8, 2014 |
TetraLogic Pharmaceuticals Corporation | |
|
| |
|
By: |
/s/ Richard L. Sherman |
|
|
Name: Richard L. Sherman |
|
|
Title: Senior Vice President, Strategic Transactions, General Counsel and Secretary |