UNITED STATES
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
WASHINGTON, D.C. 20549
FORM 8-K
CURRENT REPORT
Pursuant to Section 13 or 15(d) of the
Securities Exchange Act of 1934
Date of Report (Date of earliest event reported): July 2, 2014
Apolo Gold & Energy Inc.
(Exact Name of Registrant as Specified in Charter)
Nevada | 000-27791 | 98-0412805 | ||
(State or Other
Jurisdiction of Incorporation) |
(Commission File Number) |
(IRS Employer Identification No.) |
9th floor, Kam Chung Commercial Bldg., 19-21 Hennessy Road, Wanchai, Hong Kong
(Address of Principal Executive Offices) (Zip Code)
Registrant’s telephone number, including area code
(Former Name or Former Address
if Changed Since Last Report)
Check the appropriate box below if the Form 8-K filing is intended to simultaneously satisfy the filing obligation of the registrant under any of the following provisions:
[ ] Written communications pursuant to Rule 425 under the Securities Act (17 CFR 230.425)
[ ] Soliciting material pursuant to Rule 14a-12 under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14a-12)
[ ] Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 14d-2(b) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14d-2(b))
[ ] Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 13e-4 (c) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.13e-4(c))
Item 5.02 Departure of Directors or Certain Officers; Election of Directors; Appointment of Principal Officers; Compensatory Arrangements of Certain Officers
Effective July 2, 2014 Apolo Gold & Energy Inc. (the “Company announces the resignation of Fan Xiaojun, Zheng Heping and Huang Chin Lung from their positions as directors of the Company. Fan Xiaojun and Zheng Heping have served in their positions since January 16, 2014 and Huang Chin Lung since September 26, 2013
Item 9.01 Financial Statements and Exhibits
None.
SIGNATURES
Pursuant to the requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned hereunto duly authorized.
Dated: July 7, 2014
APOLO GOLD & ENERGY INC. | |
/s/ Kelvin Chak | |
Kelvin Chak, President, CEO, Director |