UNITED STATES
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Washington, D.C. 20549
FORM 8-K
CURRENT REPORT
Pursuant to Section 13 or 15(d) of the
Securities Exchange Act of 1934
Date of
Report (Date of earliest event reported): August 8, 2018
HotApp Blockchain Inc.
(Exact
name of registrant as specified in its charter)
Delaware
|
333-194748
|
47-4742558
|
(State
or other jurisdiction of incorporation)
|
(Commission
File No.)
|
(IRS
Employer Identification No.)
|
4800 Montgomery Lane, Suite 210
Bethesda, MD
|
20814
|
(Address
of principal executive offices)
|
(Zip
Code)
|
|
|
Registrant’s
telephone number, including area code
|
(301) 971-3940
|
N/A
Former
name or former address, if changed since last report
Check
the appropriate box below if the Form 8-K filing is intended to
simultaneously satisfy the filing obligation of the registrant
under any of the following provisions (see General Instruction A.2.
below):
☐ Written
communications pursuant to Rule 425 under the Securities Act (17
CFR 230.425)
☐ Soliciting
material pursuant to Rule 14a-12 under the Exchange Act (17 CFR
240.14a-12)
☐
Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 14d-2(b) under the
Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14d- 2(b))
☐
Pre-commencement
communications pursuant to Rule 13e-4(c) under the Exchange Act (17
CFR 240.13e-4(c))
Indicate
by check mark whether the registrant is an emerging growth company
as defined in Rule 405 of the Securities Act of 1933 (§230.405
of this chapter) or Rule 12b-2 of the Securities Exchange Act of
1934 (§240.12b-2 of this chapter).
Emerging
growth company ☑
If an
emerging growth company, indicate by check mark if the registrant
has elected not to use the extended transition period for complying
with any new or revised financial accounting standards provided
pursuant to Section 13(a) of the Exchange Act. ☐
Item
5.02
Departure
of Directors or Certain Officers; Election of Directors;
Appointment of Certain Officers; Compensatory Arrangements of
Certain Officers.
Resignation
of Lee Wang Kei as Chief Executive Officer and Chief Technology
Officer
Effective
as of August 8, 2018, Mr. Lee Wang Kei voluntarily resigned as
Chief Executive Officer (“CEO”) and Chief Technology
Officer of HotApp Blockchain Inc. (the
“Company”).
Appointment
of Chan Heng Fai as Acting Chief Executive Officer
Effective
as of August 8, 2018, the Company’s Board of Directors
appointed Mr. Chan Heng Fai as the Company’s Acting CEO. Mr.
Chan, age 73, has served as a Member of the Company’s Board
of Directors since October 23, 2014 and as the Executive Chairman
of the Company’s Board of Directors since December 1, 2017.
Mr. Chan previously served as the Company’s Chief Executive
Officer from December 31, 2014 until June 21, 2017. Mr. Chan has
served as a member of the Board of Directors of SeD Intelligent
Home Inc. since January 10, 2017, and has served as Co-Chief
Executive Officer of SeD Intelligent Home since December 29, 2017.
Mr. Chan is an expert in banking and finance, with years of
experience in these industries. He has also restructured 35
companies in various industries and countries in the past 40 years.
Mr. Chan serves as the CEO of Singapore eDevelopment, a limited
company listed on the Catalist of the Singapore Exchange Securities
Trading Limited. Singapore eDevelopment is a diversified holding
company. He was appointed director of Singapore eDevelopment on
March 1, 2014. He is also Non-Executive Director of ASX-listed
bio-technology company Holista Colltech Ltd, a position he has held
since July of 2013. From September of 1992 until July of 2015, Mr.
Chan also served as Managing Chairman of HKSE-listed Heng Fai
Enterprises Limited, a holding company now known as ZH
International Holdings, Ltd. He also served as director of Global
Medical REIT Inc. (NYSE: GMRE) from December of 2013 until July of
2015 and as director of American Housing REIT Inc. from October of
2013 to July of 2015. Mr. Chan was also formerly (i) the Managing
Director of SGX Catalist-listed SingHaiyi Group Ltd from November
of 2003 until September of 2013, which under his leadership,
transformed from a failing store-fixed business provider with net
asset value of less than S$10 million into a property trading and
investment company and finally to a property development company
with net asset value over S$150 million before Mr. Chan ceded
controlling interest in late 2012; (ii) the Executive Chairman of
China Gas Holdings Limited, a formerly failing fashion retail
company listed on SEHK which, under his direction, was restructured
to become one of a few large participants in the investment in and
operation of city gas pipeline infrastructure in China; (iii) a
director of Global Med Technologies, Inc., a medical company listed
on NASDAQ engaged in the design, development, marketing and support
information for management software products for healthcare-related
facilities; (iv) a director of Skywest Ltd, an ASX-listed airline
company; and (v) the Chairman and Director of American Pacific
Bank.
Mr.
Chan is not compensated by the Company. He is compensated by
Singapore eDevelopment Limited, our majority
shareholder.
SIGNATURES
Pursuant to the
requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the Registrant
has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the
undersigned hereunto duly authorized.
|
HOTAPP BLOCKCHAIN INC.
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Dated: August 9,
2018
|
By:
|
/s/ Conn
Flanigan
|
|
|
Name:
|
Conn
Flanigan
|
|
|
Title:
|
Secretary and
Director
|
|