Attached files
file | filename |
---|---|
EX-99.1 - PRESS RELEASE DATED JANUARY 20, 2017. - Cibolan Gold Corp | exhibit_99-1.htm |
UNITED STATES
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
|
||
Washington, D.C. 20549
|
||
________________
FORM 8-K
________________
|
||
|
||
CURRENT REPORT
Pursuant to Section 13 or 15(d) of
The Securities Exchange Act of 1934
|
||
Date of Report (Date of earliest event reported): October 13,
2015
|
||
_______________
|
||
CIBOLAN GOLD CORPORATION
|
||
(Exact name of Registrant as specified in its charter)
________________
|
||
|
||
Delaware
|
000-30230
|
65-0488983
|
(State or other jurisdictionof incorporation)
|
(Commission File Number)
|
(I.R.S. EmployerIdentification No.)
|
|
|
|
1155 W 4th Street, Suite 210,
Reno NV 89503
(Address of principal executive offices and zip code)
|
||
Registrant’s telephone number, including area code: (775)
583-4636
__________________
|
||
|
||
Check
the appropriate box below if the Form 8-K filing is intended to
simultaneously satisfy the filing obligation of the registrant
under any of the following provisions:
|
||
☐ Written
communications pursuant to Rule 425 under the Securities Act (17
CFR 230.425)
|
||
☐ Soliciting
material pursuant to Rule 14a-12 under the Exchange Act (17 CFR
240.14a-12)
|
||
☐ Pre-commencement
communications pursuant to Rule 14d-2(b) under the Exchange Act (17
CFR 240.14d-2(b))
☐ Pre-commencement
communications pursuant to Rule 13e-4(c) under the Exchange Act (17
CFR 240.13e-4(c))
|
||
|
1
Item
1.02 Termination of Material Definitive Agreement
On
January 16, 2016, the Mining Lease by and Independence Gold-Silver
Mines Inc. and General Gold Corporation a wholly owned subsidiary
of Cibolan Gold Corporation dated July 13, 2005 was terminated as a
result of nonpayment of advance minimum royalty payments required
under the agreement.
Item 5.02 Departure of Directors or Principal Officers; Election of
Directors; Appointment of Principal Officers.
(b)
Bryson
Goodwin resigned as a member of the Board of Directors effective
October 1, 2015.
Shane
K. Dyer resigned as a member of the Board of Directors effective
February 15, 2016.
Walter
A. Marting, Jr. resigned as a member of the Board of Directors
effective June 7, 2016.
Larry
Max Bigler resigned as a member of the Board of Directors effective
July 22, 2016.
A copy
of the press release announcing the settlement and the above
resignations has been filed as Exhibit 99.1 to this report and is
incorporated herein by reference.
Item
9.01 Financial Statements and Exhibits.
(d)
Exhibits.
2
SIGNATURES
Pursuant to the
requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant
has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the
undersigned hereunto duly authorized.
Dated:
January 20, 2017
|
GENERAL METALS
CORPORATION
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
By:
|
/s/
Daniel
J. Forbush
|
|
|
|
Name:
Daniel
J. Forbush
|
|
|
|
Title:
Chief
Executive Officer
|
|
3
EXHIBIT INDEX
Exhibit Number
|
Description
|
4