Attached files
file | filename |
---|---|
EX-99.1 - PRESS RELEASE - WESTMOORE HOLDINGS, INC. | westmoore_8k-ex9901.htm |
UNITED STATES
SECURITIES
AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Washington,
DC 20549
FORM
8-K
CURRENT
REPORT
Pursuant
to Section 13 or 15(d) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934
October
1, 2009
|
Date of
Report (Date of earliest event reported)
WESTMOORE
HOLDINGS, INC.
|
(Exact
name of registrant as specified in its charter)
Nevada
|
000-33153
|
52-2220728
|
(State
or other jurisdiction of incorporation)
|
(Commission
File Number)
|
(IRS
Employer Identification No.)
|
1600
E. 33rd
Street, Unit A, Long Beach, CA
90807
|
(Address of principal executive offices)
(Zip Code)
Registrant’s
telephone number, including area
code: __________________
Check the
appropriate box below if the Form 8-K filing is intended to simultaneously
satisfy the filing obligation of the Registrant under any of the following
provisions (see General Instruction A.2. below):
[ ]
Written communications pursuant to Rule 425 under the Securities Act (17 CFR
230.425)
[ ]
Soliciting material pursuant to Rule 14a-12 under the Exchange Act (17 CFR
240.14a-12)
[ ]
Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 14d-2(b) under the Exchange Act
(17 CFR 240.14d-2(b))
[ ]
Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 13e-4(c) under the Exchange Act
(17 CFR 240.13e-4(c))
Item
5.02
|
Departure
of Directors or Certain Officers; Election of Directors; Appointment of
Certain Officers.
|
Westmoore
Holdings, Inc., a Nevada corporation (the “Company”), has received and accepted
the following resignations:
|
a)
|
Effective
January 31, 2009, Shawn Crawford resigned as Secretary of the
Company
|
|
b)
|
Effective
August 10, 2009, Robert L. Jennings, II resigned as a Director and
Treasurer of the Company;
|
|
c)
|
Effective
August 10, 2009, Michael Graven resigned as a Director of the
Company;
|
|
d)
|
Effective
August 10, 2009, Joseph Duffel resigned as a Director of the
Company;
|
|
e)
|
Effective
September 25, 2009, George Alvarez resigned as a Director of the
Company;
|
|
f)
|
Effective
September 29, 2009, Colin Tay resigned as a Director of the
Company;
|
|
g)
|
Effective
September 30, 2009, Mark Molenaar resigned as a Director of the
Company;
|
|
h)
|
Effective
October 1, 2009, Matthew Jennings resigned as the President, Treasurer,
Secretary, and Chief Executive Officer of the
Company;
|
|
i)
|
Effective
October 2, 2009, Matthew Jennings resigned as a Director of the
Company.
|
As of October 1, 2009, the Board
of Directors of the Company voted by Unanimous Written Consent to elect Kevin E.
Wheeler to serve as President, Treasurer, Secretary, and Chief Executive Officer
of the Company until his consent is revoked or until his successor(s) are
elected or appointed. In addition, as of October 2, 2009, the
majority shareholders of the Company have elected Kevin E. Wheeler to serve as
the sole director of the Company until his consent is revoked or until his
successor(s) are elected or appointed.
Kevin Eugene Wheeler, 39, was the
president of Focal Point Management Group, LLC which he started in 2007 to
provide consulting services to public and private corporations under $200
million. While there, he supplied finance, accounting, and strategic management
services to several companies in the financial services, manufacturing, and
construction industries. Mr. Wheeler has been an outside accounting consultant
with the Company over the last 5 years. His career has been focused on small to
mid-cap companies between $5 million and $120 million. This early stage focus
has provided Mr. Wheeler with experience in dealing with the numerous hurdles
that so often inhibit a small company’s growth. He is a certified CPA and
graduated from Azusa Pacific University in 1992 with a degree in
Accounting.
There have been no related party
transactions between Kevin E. Wheeler and the Company. Kevin E.
Wheeler has no family relationships with any previous director or executive
officer of the Company. Attached hereto as Exhibit 99.1, is a copy of
the Press Release as issued by the Company.
Item
9.01
|
Financial
Statements and Exhibits
|
(d)
Exhibits.
99.1
|
Press
Release
|
SIGNATURES
Pursuant
to the requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant has
duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned hereunto
duly authorized.
WESTMOORE HOLDINGS, INC. | |||
Date: October
12,
2009
|
By:
|
/s/ Kevin E. Wheeler | |
Kevin E. Wheeler, CEO |