Attached files
file | filename |
---|---|
EX-99.1 - EXHIBIT 99.1 - PRESS RELEASE - BlackRock Inc. | ex99-1.htm |
UNITED
STATES
SECURITIES
AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Washington,
D.C. 20549
FORM
8-K
CURRENT
REPORT
Pursuant
to Section 13 OR 15(d) of
The
Securities Exchange Act of 1934
Date
of Report (Date of earliest event reported):
October 9, 2009 (October 8,
2009)
BLACKROCK,
INC.
(Exact
name of registrant as specified in its charter)
Delaware
|
001-33099
|
32-0174431
|
(State
or other jurisdiction of
incorporation)
|
(Commission
File
Number)
|
(IRS
Employer
Identification
No.)
|
40 East 52nd Street,
New York, New York
|
10022
|
|
(Address
of principal executive offices)
|
(Zip
Code)
|
|
Registrant’s
telephone number, including area code:
|
(212)
810-5300
|
|
N/A
|
||
(Former
name or former address, if changed since last
report.)
|
Check
the appropriate box below if the Form 8-K filing is intended to simultaneously
satisfy the filing obligation of the registrant under any of the following
provisions (see General Instruction A.2. below):
[ ]
|
Written
communications pursuant to Rule 425 under the Securities Act (17 CFR
230.425)
|
[ ]
|
Soliciting
material pursuant to Rule 14a-12 under the Exchange Act (17 CFR
240.14a-12)
|
[ ]
|
Pre-commencement
communications pursuant to Rule 14d-2(b) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR
240.14d-2(b))
|
[ ]
|
Pre-commencement
communications pursuant to Rule 13e-4(c) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR
240.13e-4(c))
|
Item
5.02
|
Departure
of Directors or Certain Officers; Election of Directors; Appointment of
Certain Officers; Compensatory Arrangements of Certain
Officers.
|
(b) Departure
of Directors
On October
8, 2009, Brian T. Moynihan and Daniel C. Sontag resigned from the
Board of Directors (the “Board”) of BlackRock, Inc. (“BlackRock” or the
“Company”).
(d) Election
of Directors
On October 9, 2009, the Board appointed
Sallie L. Krawcheck and Mark D. Linsz to serve as directors of the
Board. Ms. Krawcheck is the President of Global Wealth and Investment
Management for Bank of America Corporation (“Bank of
America”). Mr. Linsz is the Corporate Treasurer for Bank of
America. Ms. Krawcheck and Mr. Linsz were appointed to the Board as
the two designees of Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (“Merrill Lynch”),
a wholly-owned subsidiary of
Bank of America, pursuant to the Second Amended and
Restated Stockholder Agreement, dated as of February 27, 2009, among
Merrill Lynch Group, Inc., Merrill Lynch and the Company.
On January 1, 2009, Bank of America
acquired Merrill Lynch, which continues as a wholly-owned subsidiary of Bank of
America. As of June 30, 2009, Merrill Lynch owned approximately 4.6%
of BlackRock’s common stock outstanding and held approximately 46.3% of
BlackRock’s total outstanding capital stock on a fully diluted
basis. The Company has previously disclosed its transactions with
Merrill Lynch and Bank of America.
The
Company issued a press release on October 9, 2009 announcing the appointment of
Ms. Krawcheck and Mr. Linsz. A copy of the press release is included as
Exhibit 99.1 hereto.
Item
9.01
|
Financial
Statements and Exhibits
|
(d) Exhibits
99.1
Press
Release of BlackRock, Inc. issued on October 9, 2009.
SIGNATURES
Pursuant
to the requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant has
duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned hereunto
duly authorized.
Date: October
9, 2009
|
BlackRock,
Inc.
(Registrant)
By: /s/ Daniel R.
Waltcher
Daniel
R. Waltcher
Managing
Director and
Deputy
General Counsel
|
EXHIBIT
INDEX
99.1
|
Press
Release of BlackRock, Inc. issued on October 9,
2009.
|